U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04115
  • Case Name: Luverne Truck Equipment, Inc. v. Worldwide Equipment, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice]
  • September 12, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 12, 2017: [Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 13, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 10, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • April 10, 2017: [Brief]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 31, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 24, 2017: [Brief]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 23, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 23, 2017: [Brief]
  • March 23, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 23, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 23, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • March 06, 2017: [Substitute Party]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • February 15, 2017: [Withdraw]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • January 20, 2017: [Brief]
  • January 20, 2017: [Compel]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 27, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Order for Form 52]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 18, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 10, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 10, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Notice]
  • June 24, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 24, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 24, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 24, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.