U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-01027
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Borns et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Judgment - Consent]
  • May 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Extend]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 17, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 15, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • July 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 24, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 24, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.