U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04094
  • Case Name: Williams v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2020: [Withdraw]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 15, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 17, 2019: [Extend]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 17, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 10, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 13, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2019: [Enforce]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2019: [Extend]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 25, 2019: [Extend]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 28, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 24, 2018: [Extend]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 06, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
June, 2018
  • June 30, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 01, 2018: [Extend]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • March 08, 2018: [Briefing Schedule]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 29, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 31, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • November 02, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • November 02, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 01, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 28, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 28, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 27, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2016: [Mail Returned]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 12, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 10, 2016: [Received]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Supplement]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Response]
  • June 25, 2015: [Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.