U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03012
  • Case Name: Klaudt v. Jackley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 25, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 04, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • January 04, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 04, 2016: [USCA Order]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 17, 2015: [Proposed Order]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Brief]
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 10, 2015: [Brief]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 26, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • June 26, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.