U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04117
  • Case Name: Florek v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 16, 2016: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 11, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • May 10, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • May 10, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 05, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 02, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 11, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • December 01, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Brief]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Response to Habeas Petition (28:2254)]
  • July 31, 2015: [Brief]
  • July 31, 2015: [Received]
  • July 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 01, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 01, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 01, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • July 01, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.