U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05057
  • Case Name: LeBeau v. Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Mail Returned]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 14, 2018: [Leave to]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
  • November 09, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 14, 2015: [Continue]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Judgment]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 05, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 04, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 04, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.