U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:08-cr-40119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ochocki
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 10, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 29, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 07, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 03, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 08, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 08, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order of Detention]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 25, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 19, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 13, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 13, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 13, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 05, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 27, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 27, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 27, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 19, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • October 19, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 29, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 29, 2015: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Continue]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 24, 2015: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 20, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 17, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.