U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:97-cr-50023-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Knudsen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Receipt for Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.