U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Cisneros
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 28, 2015: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 27, 2015: [Sentencing]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 28, 2015: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 28, 2015: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 23, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2015: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 18, 2015: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 02, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 25, 2015: [Petition to Plead Guilty (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 24, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2015: [Request]
  • August 19, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 18, 2015: [Interpreter Needed]
  • August 18, 2015: [Arrest]
  • August 18, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 18, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.