U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 06, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 27, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 27, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 27, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2015: [Arrest]
  • August 18, 2015: [Indictment]
  • August 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.