U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conteh et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • January 11, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • January 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Passport - Return of]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 23, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2018: [Passport - Return of]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 02, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 17, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 13, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 13, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 31, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 21, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 07, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 24, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 12, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 09, 2018: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 06, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 06, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • June 04, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • June 04, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 21, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • March 22, 2018: [Dismiss Count]
  • March 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 21, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 21, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • March 20, 2018: [Jury List]
  • March 20, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 20, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order]
  • March 06, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 02, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • February 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • February 21, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • February 21, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • February 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 14, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2018: [Joinder]
  • February 12, 2018: [In Limine]
  • February 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 05, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 05, 2018: [Joinder]
  • February 05, 2018: [Objection]
  • February 03, 2018: [Reply]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice]
  • February 02, 2018: [Dismiss Count]
  • February 02, 2018: [Joinder]
  • February 02, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 02, 2018: [Objection]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 30, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 30, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 30, 2018: [Joinder]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 29, 2018: [Joinder]
  • January 29, 2018: [Objection]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 27, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 26, 2018: [Extend]
  • January 26, 2018: [Joinder]
  • January 26, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 25, 2018: [Request]
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Joinder]
  • November 29, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 22, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • November 13, 2017: [Joinder]
  • November 12, 2017: [Joinder]
  • November 07, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • November 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 06, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 26, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 19, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 14, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • March 10, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 10, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 05, 2016: [Reconsideration]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 01, 2016: [Response]
July, 2016
  • July 31, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 31, 2016: [Transcript]
  • July 27, 2016: [Extend]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [Response]
  • July 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2016: [Extend]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 12, 2016: [Brief]
  • July 12, 2016: [Response]
  • July 12, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 12, 2016: [Suppress]
  • July 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 12, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 11, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations - IRS Summons]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 28, 2016: [Extend]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • June 14, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 13, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • June 13, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 13, 2016: [Extend]
  • June 10, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • June 10, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 08, 2016: [Reconsideration]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • April 07, 2016: [Reconsideration]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2016: [Text Order]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 23, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • March 09, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • March 09, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 07, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 24, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 24, 2016: [Suppress]
  • February 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 22, 2016: [Suppress]
  • February 21, 2016: [Response]
  • February 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 09, 2016: [Extend]
  • February 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 04, 2016: [Suppress]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2016: [Response]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 14, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 05, 2016: [Extend]
  • January 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 04, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • December 29, 2015: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 29, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 29, 2015: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 16, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 11, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 07, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2015: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 04, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 03, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 24, 2015: [Search & Seizure Warrant Issued]
  • November 24, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • November 24, 2015: [Application for Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant]
  • November 24, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 23, 2015: [Request]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 23, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2015: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 18, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 18, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 16, 2015: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 16, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 16, 2015: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 16, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 13, 2015: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 13, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 11, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • November 04, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • November 04, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 04, 2015: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 23, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2015: [Sealed Order]
  • September 23, 2015: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 23, 2015: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2015: [Application for Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant]
  • August 19, 2015: [Search & Seizure Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2015: [Indictment]
  • August 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.