U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Becker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 28, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2015: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 30, 2015: [Consent]
  • October 30, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 15, 2015: [Petition to Plead Guilty (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 11, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 11, 2015: [Request]
  • September 10, 2015: [Arrest]
  • September 10, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 10, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Indictment]
  • August 18, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.