U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-30080-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Sitting Bear et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 06, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 06, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 18, 2015: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • September 17, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 17, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Memorandum Letter]
  • August 21, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 19, 2015: [Reduce Sentence]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.