U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30093-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Big Eagle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Transcript]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 30, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 27, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 23, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 23, 2015: [Court Reporter Information]
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 21, 2015: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 20, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 06, 2015: [Allocution Statement]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 23, 2015: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2015: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2015: [Furlough]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • August 31, 2015: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 31, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 31, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 31, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • August 27, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 21, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 21, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • August 20, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 20, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 20, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 20, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.