U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:98-cr-10034-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Antelope
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 10, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 26, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 18, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 12, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 31, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.