U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Curry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Remark]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • June 19, 2020: [Certificate]
  • June 17, 2020: [Response]
  • June 12, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 08, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 10, 2017: [Transcript]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 24, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 24, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • July 14, 2017: [Extend]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 02, 2017: [Response]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • April 28, 2017: [Dismiss Count]
  • April 21, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 21, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • April 21, 2017: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • April 21, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • April 20, 2017: [Verdict]
  • April 20, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 20, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • April 20, 2017: [Return of Service]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 19, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 18, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2017: [Jury List]
  • April 17, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 17, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order]
  • April 10, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • April 06, 2017: [Response]
  • April 05, 2017: [Response]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Request]
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 27, 2017: [In Limine]
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 26, 2017: [In Limine]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • March 08, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • March 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 06, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 03, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice]
  • February 23, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 23, 2017: [In Limine]
  • February 21, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2016: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 18, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice]
  • September 09, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • September 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 15, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 01, 2016: [Response]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 29, 2016: [Extend]
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 13, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2015: [Consent]
  • October 05, 2015: [Waiver]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • September 16, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • September 16, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2015: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 01, 2015: [Reconsideration]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 24, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 24, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 21, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 21, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 21, 2015: [Request]
  • August 21, 2015: [Arrest]
  • August 21, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 21, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.