U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ostby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 21, 2016: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 16, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 16, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 16, 2015: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 21, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 08, 2015: [Continue]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 21, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 21, 2015: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.