U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-30044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 05, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 18, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 07, 2016: [Extend]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Request]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 05, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • January 13, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • January 13, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 13, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 17, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 16, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 16, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.