U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Helmerick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Disposition of Appeal on Magistrate Judge Conviction and/or Sentence]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Reply]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Response]
  • December 07, 2015: [Extend]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Extend]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 13, 2015: [Extend]
  • November 09, 2015: [Exhibit List]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Brief]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2015: [Continue]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 01, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 27, 2015: [Receipt for Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.