U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vandekamp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • February 01, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 01, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 07, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 06, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 29, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 28, 2015: [Arrest]
  • August 28, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 28, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • August 28, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.