U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-50090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romero et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Amended Judgment to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 03, 2017: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 03, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 03, 2017: [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Receipt for Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.