U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-30090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Refert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 07, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Proposed Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Answer of Garnishee]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Answer of Garnishee]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • August 31, 2015: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • August 31, 2015: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.