U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dillon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 08, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 05, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2015: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Allocution Statement]
  • October 08, 2015: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 18, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 18, 2015: [Consent]
  • September 18, 2015: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 11, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2015: [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 10, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 10, 2015: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 10, 2015: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 01, 2015: [Affidavit]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.