U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mora
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 04, 2017: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 21, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Waiver]
  • August 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 28, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 22, 2016: [Discovery]
  • July 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 12, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 12, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 02, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 02, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 02, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2015: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 01, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 01, 2015: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.