U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dickey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 22, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 01, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 25, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 26, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 19, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Produce ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 11, 2020: [Response]
  • September 11, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 11, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 10, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Letter]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 25, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 18, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 16, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 08, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 26, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 07, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 14, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 14, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 12, 2016: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 29, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 29, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 29, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 23, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2016: [Departure]
  • August 22, 2016: [Variance]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 31, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 31, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 26, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 25, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 24, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 24, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Waiver]
  • October 09, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 08, 2015: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 08, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • October 08, 2015: [Warrant Issued]
  • October 08, 2015: [Arrest]
  • October 08, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2015: [Oral Order]
  • October 08, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 04, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 04, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 04, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 04, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 02, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.