U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morris et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 26, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 13, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 22, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 22, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 01, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 02, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • September 02, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 18, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 18, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order]
  • December 29, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 29, 2015: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 28, 2015: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 10, 2015: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 06, 2015: [Reconsideration]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 27, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 26, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 22, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • October 06, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 09, 2015: [Notice]
  • September 08, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 04, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 04, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 04, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 04, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 02, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.