U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:00-cr-30072-2
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Kills In Water et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 27, 2018: [Furlough]
  • February 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • January 30, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • January 30, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 30, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 19, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • September 19, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 19, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 19, 2016: [Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • September 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order for Summons - Probation Request]
  • September 09, 2016: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 09, 2016: [Request for Summons]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 07, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • January 07, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 06, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 06, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 30, 2015: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2015: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2015: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 23, 2015: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 23, 2015: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2015: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 16, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 04, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 04, 2015: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 04, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order for Summons - Probation Request]
  • October 21, 2015: [Petition to Revoke]
  • October 21, 2015: [Request for Summons]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 10, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 03, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 02, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.