U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:97-cr-40009-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • September 22, 2015: [Response]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 02, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 02, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.