U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-50128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LaDeaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 31, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 13, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 25, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 06, 2022: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 23, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • February 28, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 28, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • October 14, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • October 14, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
  • October 14, 2021: [Verdict]
  • October 14, 2021: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 14, 2021: [Jury Question]
  • October 14, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 14, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 13, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • October 13, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 13, 2021: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • October 12, 2021: [Jury List]
  • October 12, 2021: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 07, 2021: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 06, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • September 27, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Brief]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • September 24, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • September 24, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 24, 2021: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice]
  • September 17, 2021: [Extend]
  • September 16, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 28, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Extend]
  • July 22, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 25, 2021: [Extend]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 22, 2021: [Supplement]
  • April 16, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • March 11, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Waiver]
  • February 26, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 11, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [Request]
  • December 07, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 26, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 26, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 22, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • October 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Request for Early Termination]
  • September 04, 2015: [Request for Early Termination]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.