U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40106-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Conn et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • August 05, 2016: [Reduce Sentence]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Johnson Claim - Motion to Reduce Sentence (filed in Civil Case)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 02, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 18, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 07, 2016: [Leave to]
  • April 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 04, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 04, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 04, 2016: [Variance]
  • April 01, 2016: [Continue]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Letter]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Letter]
  • March 07, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 01, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 29, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2016: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2016: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2016: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • January 22, 2016: [Verdict]
  • January 22, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • January 22, 2016: [Response to Jury Question]
  • January 22, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • January 22, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 22, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • January 21, 2016: [Response]
  • January 21, 2016: [Brief]
  • January 20, 2016: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • January 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 19, 2016: [In Limine]
  • January 19, 2016: [Jury List]
  • January 19, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 19, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • January 18, 2016: [Notice]
  • January 17, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 14, 2016: [Transcript]
  • January 12, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 12, 2016: [In Limine]
  • January 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2016: [Compel ]
  • January 10, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 06, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Letter]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 18, 2015: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 16, 2015: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 16, 2015: [Oral Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • December 16, 2015: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 15, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 14, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 14, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2015: [Response]
  • December 11, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2015: [Sealed Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 11, 2015: [In Limine]
  • December 11, 2015: [Leave to]
  • December 11, 2015: [Remark]
  • December 10, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 09, 2015: [Leave to]
  • December 09, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 09, 2015: [In Limine]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • December 09, 2015: [Supplement]
  • December 08, 2015: [Seal Existing Document]
  • December 08, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 08, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice]
  • December 08, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 08, 2015: [In Limine]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 07, 2015: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 07, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Objection]
  • December 04, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2015: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 03, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 03, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 03, 2015: [Subpoena Issued]
  • December 03, 2015: [Subpoena(s)]
  • December 03, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice]
  • December 01, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 01, 2015: [In Limine]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Continue]
  • November 30, 2015: [Subpoena Issued]
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • November 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 29, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 27, 2015: [Subpoena(s)]
  • November 24, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • November 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 24, 2015: [Compel ]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2015: [Letter]
  • October 05, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 30, 2015: [Release from Custody]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2015: [Response]
  • September 15, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 14, 2015: [Discovery]
  • September 14, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 14, 2015: [Request]
  • September 11, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 11, 2015: [Request]
  • September 11, 2015: [Response]
  • September 10, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 04, 2015: [Arrest]
  • September 04, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 04, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 04, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 04, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 04, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 04, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 04, 2015: [Interpreter Needed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.