U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03016
  • Case Name: Brown Thunder v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 09, 2017: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 05, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 05, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 28, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 28, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 28, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 14, 2016: [Extend]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 02, 2016: [Response to Motion to Vacate (28:2255)]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law]
  • March 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2016: [Judgment as a Matter of Law]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 04, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Consent]
  • January 20, 2016: [Certificate]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice]
  • January 14, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 31, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 04, 2015: [Letter Received]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 08, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 08, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.