U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 15, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 05, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2016: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 12, 2016: [Transcript]
  • December 07, 2016: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • November 21, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 21, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 18, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 02, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 01, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 01, 2016: [Court Reporter Information]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 31, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 31, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 29, 2016: [Vacate (Not 28:2255)]
  • September 27, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 10, 2016: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • August 10, 2016: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • August 10, 2016: [Verdict]
  • August 10, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • August 10, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 10, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 09, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 09, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • August 09, 2016: [Jury List]
  • August 08, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 05, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice]
  • August 04, 2016: [Leave to]
  • August 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 04, 2016: [In Limine]
  • August 04, 2016: [Brief]
  • August 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • July 27, 2016: [Brief]
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice]
  • July 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice]
  • July 26, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 26, 2016: [In Limine]
  • July 21, 2016: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2016: [In Limine]
  • July 18, 2016: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • July 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2016: [Subpoena Issued]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • July 12, 2016: [Subpoena(s)]
  • July 11, 2016: [Subpoena(s)]
  • July 11, 2016: [Request]
  • July 11, 2016: [Jury List]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 24, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 31, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 13, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 12, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 10, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • May 10, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 06, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • May 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2016: [Reconsideration]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Competency Report]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • April 05, 2016: [Indictment]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2016: [Suppress]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • February 22, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • February 22, 2016: [Competency Evaluation]
  • February 17, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • February 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2016: [Hearing ]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Response]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2016: [Continue]
  • January 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 25, 2016: [Request]
  • January 20, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 15, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 14, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2016: [Quash]
  • January 12, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 19, 2015: [Discovery]
  • October 14, 2015: [Response]
  • October 13, 2015: [Request]
  • October 13, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2015: [Consent]
  • October 09, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 28, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 15, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 15, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 15, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 15, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 09, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.