U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 22, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 20, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 19, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 11, 2016: [Departure]
  • April 11, 2016: [Variance]
  • April 11, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 11, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 16, 2015: [Discovery]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Response]
  • September 17, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 17, 2015: [Request]
  • September 16, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 15, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • September 15, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 09, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.