U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 16, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 10, 2020: [Letter]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Letter]
  • November 09, 2017: [Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 27, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • September 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Variance]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 20, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 19, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • July 12, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 12, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 12, 2016: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 12, 2016: [Verdict]
  • July 12, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • July 12, 2016: [Jury List]
  • July 12, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 12, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 12, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 11, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • July 09, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 08, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 08, 2016: [Witness List]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice]
  • June 28, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • June 28, 2016: [Seal Existing Document]
  • June 23, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice]
  • June 23, 2016: [In Limine]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 14, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order]
  • June 09, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order]
  • June 03, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • May 24, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • May 03, 2016: [Affidavit]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • April 19, 2016: [Request]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 30, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Request]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 23, 2015: [Discovery]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 20, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 20, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 19, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 19, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 19, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 19, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 19, 2015: [Request]
  • November 12, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 09, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.