U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • July 26, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 24, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2015: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 06, 2015: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 06, 2015: [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 06, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 06, 2015: [Extend]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Order]
  • September 15, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 14, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 10, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2015: [Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.