U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shot
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 24, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 24, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 07, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 23, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 27, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 09, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 02, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 03, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 03, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 25, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 18, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Notice]
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2015: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 06, 2015: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 06, 2015: [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order]
  • October 30, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 29, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • October 29, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 29, 2015: [Request]
  • October 29, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 28, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2015: [Arrest]
  • October 27, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 27, 2015: [Request]
  • October 27, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2015: [Bail Report]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.