U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 04, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 04, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 04, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 05, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 16, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2020: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 16, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 16, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 16, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 06, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 17, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 16, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 09, 2016: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 09, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 17, 2015: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 17, 2015: [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2015
  • October 01, 2015: [Stipulation]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 30, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 29, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 29, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 29, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 29, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 29, 2015: [Request]
  • September 29, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 28, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 28, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 10, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 10, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.