U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quigley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 17, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 20, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 23, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • July 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 30, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 30, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 30, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 05, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 05, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 05, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 05, 2016: [Release from Custody]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 30, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 30, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 30, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 29, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 29, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 03, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 01, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 17, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 13, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 12, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 12, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2015: [Arrest]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 12, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • November 12, 2015: [Request]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 10, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.