U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Has Horns
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 11, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 20, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 07, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 07, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 07, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Downward Departure]
  • December 28, 2015: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2015: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2015: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2015: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 10, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 30, 2015: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 30, 2015: [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2015: [Request]
  • September 15, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 15, 2015: [Request]
  • September 10, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 10, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.