U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 30, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 09, 2017: [Forfeiture]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Declaration of Publication]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 29, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • November 28, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 28, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 07, 2016: [Forfeiture]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 29, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • August 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 16, 2016: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 13, 2016: [Waiver]
  • February 13, 2016: [Consent]
  • February 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 04, 2016: [Suppress]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 18, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2015: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • December 10, 2015: [Suppress]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 19, 2015: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2015: [Consent]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2015: [Request]
  • October 02, 2015: [Stipulation]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 18, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 15, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 14, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 11, 2015: [Arrest]
  • September 11, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 11, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.