U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 17, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 29, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 24, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 26, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 17, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 22, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 20, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 20, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 06, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 15, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2015: [Consent]
  • December 02, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2015: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Consent]
  • October 15, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [Request]
  • October 02, 2015: [Stipulation]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Request]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 17, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 16, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 15, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 15, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 15, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.