U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buffalo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 23, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 10, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 03, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 15, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 26, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • June 08, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 29, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 29, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • February 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 31, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2015: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 10, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 06, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2015: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 28, 2015: [Consent]
  • October 28, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Arrest]
  • September 23, 2015: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 10, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.