U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-30114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kitteaux et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2019: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 11, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 11, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 02, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 15, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 31, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 15, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 15, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • October 15, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 27, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 26, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 18, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 18, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 17, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 24, 2018: [Furlough]
  • September 20, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 07, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 31, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 31, 2018: [Order]
  • August 31, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 31, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 31, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 31, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 31, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • April 26, 2018: [Change Venue]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 08, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 20, 2017: [Furlough]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 18, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 14, 2017: [Furlough]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 12, 2017: [Furlough]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 11, 2017: [Furlough]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 19, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order]
  • June 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 13, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 13, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 09, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 07, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 04, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.