U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 04, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 28, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 21, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2015: [Request]
  • September 18, 2015: [Arrest]
  • September 18, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 18, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 16, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.