U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boerschig
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 29, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 29, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Waiver]
  • December 15, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 11, 2015: [Consent]
  • December 11, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 10, 2015: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • December 08, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 08, 2015: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 08, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 08, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 28, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 28, 2015: [Request]
  • September 24, 2015: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 22, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 22, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 22, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 18, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 18, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 16, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 16, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.