U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Standing Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 08, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 07, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Consent]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 17, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 17, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 17, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 17, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 17, 2015: [Arrest]
  • September 17, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 17, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2015: [Indictment]
  • September 16, 2015: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.