U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beatty-Waters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Request for Early Termination]
  • April 18, 2018: [Request for Early Termination]
  • April 06, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 14, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 14, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • January 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 08, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2015: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2015: [Information - Felony]
  • September 17, 2015: [Request for Summons]
  • September 17, 2015: [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 17, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 17, 2015: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.