U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-30111-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Provancial
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 27, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 21, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 21, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 01, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 17, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 10, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 30, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 30, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 30, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 30, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 30, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 01, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 26, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • January 26, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 26, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 06, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 24, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 22, 2016: [Furlough]
  • January 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 23, 2015: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 23, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 08, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 30, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 29, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 29, 2015: [Request]
  • September 29, 2015: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 29, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 28, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 23, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 23, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.