U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30176-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Two Eagle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 26, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 13, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 26, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 22, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 20, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 20, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 05, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 01, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 03, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 20, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • August 07, 2017: [Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 18, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 05, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 31, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 19, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 27, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 27, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 02, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 23, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 16, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 16, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 16, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 26, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 20, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 18, 2015: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • December 18, 2015: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 14, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 10, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2015: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 10, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 01, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 01, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 01, 2015: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 01, 2015: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 24, 2015: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.