U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCloskey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 31, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 31, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 24, 2016: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 22, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 22, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 18, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • August 09, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 05, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Court Reporter Information]
  • August 05, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 22, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Consent]
  • December 11, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 27, 2015: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 27, 2015: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 27, 2015: [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2015: [Consent]
  • October 16, 2015: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 30, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 29, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 28, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.